Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03068
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Jan 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
John C. Selbach
Represented By
John C. Selbach
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, January 07, 2022
12 12 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Fri 01/07 9:36 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 01/06 5:38 PM
Notice of Dismissal (Voluntary) filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of John C. Selbach. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
10 10 order Stipulation and Order Fri 12/03 7:51 AM
Agreed Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Stipulation filed by John C. Selbach
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 11/30 10:49 AM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By John C. Selbach and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of John C. Selbach. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Thu 11/04 6:37 AM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Stipulation filed by John C. Selbach
Monday, November 01, 2021
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 11/01 4:34 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By John C. Selbach and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of John C. Selbach. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 10/12 9:52 AM
Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By John C. Selbach and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of John C. Selbach. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 09/23 4:51 PM
Stipulation Regarding Acceptance of Service of Process By John C. Selbach and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of John C. Selbach. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
4 4 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 09/09 2:53 PM
Summons and notice issued to John C. Selbach Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Tue 09/07 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 119004. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/03 6:55 AM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 21-03068 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Related [+] (Manley) Modified on 9/3/2021 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, September 02, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 09/02 8:22 PM
Adversary case 21-03068 Complaint against John C. Selbach filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]