Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03074
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Jan 06, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Charles Osthimer III
Represented By
Charles Osthimer III
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Thursday, January 06, 2022
6 6 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Thu 01/06 12:08 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 01/05 3:55 PM
Notice of Dismissal (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
4 4 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 09/09 3:02 PM
Summons and notice issued to Charles Osthimer III Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Tue 09/07 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 119004. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/03 6:55 AM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 21-03074 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Related [+] (Manley) Modified on 9/3/2021 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, September 02, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 09/02 9:28 PM
Adversary case 21-03074 Complaint against Charles Osthimer III filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]