Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee v. Sherry
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Kevin R Huennekens |
Case #: | 3:21-ap-03077 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 02, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Jeffrey Sherry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 02, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Wed 04/02 9:05 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Dietz, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany) |
|
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons and notice issued to Jeffrey Sherry (Bullock, Nathaniel) |
|
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
court
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee
Tue 09/07 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 119004. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem) |
|
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 09/03 6:55 AM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 21-03077 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. (Manley) Modified on 9/3/2021 (Manley, Candace) |
|
Thursday, September 02, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-03077 Complaint against Jeffrey Sherry filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany) |