Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03080
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Mar 06, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Karol Corbin Walker
Represented By
Karol Corbin Walker
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Monday, March 06, 2023
17 17 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Mon 03/06 4:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 02/22 5:08 PM
Joint Stipulation for Dismissal By Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee and Between Karol Corbin Walker filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 01/26 6:40 PM
Joint Stipulation (Consolidated Stipulation for Partial Dismissal of Karol Corbin Walker) By Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee and Between Karol Corbin Walker filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
14 14 30+ pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Fri 12/03 8:18 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, November 19, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Fri 11/19 10:29 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Erika L. Morabito of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (Morabito, Erika)
Related: [-] related document(s)12 Motion to Approve filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
12 12 motion Approve Fri 11/19 10:28 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under FRBP 9019 filed by Erika L. Morabito of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Morabito, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
11 11 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Tue 11/02 8:16 AM
Order Denying Motion to Consolidate Cases for Purpose of Joint Administration and for Related Relief Related [+]. (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
10 10 court Hearing held Tue 10/19 2:12 PM
Hearing held; Motion to Expedite Hearing GRANTED; Motion to Consolidate Denied; Appearance(s): Diana McGraw for Defendant; Rex Lee for Plaintiff Related [+] (Gary, Lisa)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Consolidate filed by Karol Corbin Walker,6 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Karol Corbin Walker
Monday, October 18, 2021
9 9 answer Answer Mon 10/18 7:32 PM
Answer Related [+] filed by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw of Fox Rothschild LLP on behalf of Karol Corbin Walker. (McGraw, Diana Lyn)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
8 8 misc Brief Mon 10/18 4:13 PM
Brief in Objection Related [+] filed by Erika L. Morabito of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee.(Morabito, Erika)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Consolidate filed by Karol Corbin Walker,6 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Karol Corbin Walker
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/12 9:22 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw of Fox Rothschild LLP on behalf of Karol Corbin Walker. Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 11:00 AM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia. (McGraw, Diana Lyn)
Related: [-] related document(s)5 Motion to Consolidate filed by Karol Corbin Walker,6 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Karol Corbin Walker
6 6 motion Expedite Hearing Tue 10/12 9:21 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] filed by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw of Fox Rothschild LLP on behalf of Karol Corbin Walker. (McGraw, Diana Lyn)
Related: [-] ument(s)5 Motion to Consolidate filed by Karol Corbin Walker
5 5 motion Consolidate Tue 10/12 8:08 PM
Motion to Consolidate Lead Case 20-cv-03142 with 21-cv-03080 filed by Diana Lyn Curtis McGraw of Fox Rothschild LLP on behalf of Karol Corbin Walker. (McGraw, Diana Lyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 09, 2021
4 4 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 09/09 4:12 PM
Summons and notice issued to Karol Corbin Walker Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Tue 09/07 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 119004. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/03 6:55 AM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 21-03080 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Related [+] (Manley) Modified on 9/3/2021 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, September 02, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 09/02 10:18 PM
Adversary case 21-03080 Complaint against Karol Corbin Walker filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]