Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34574

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin R Huennekens
Case #: 3:21-ap-03085
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Vernon Inge, Jr.
Represented By
Vernon Inge, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Represented By
Brittany Jane Nelson
Quinn Emanuel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
15 15 court Adversary Proceeding Closed Wed 01/12 2:57 PM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 01/12 12:40 PM
Notice of Dismissal (Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) filed by Brittany Jane Nelson of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
13 13 30+ pgs order Order on Motion to Approve Fri 12/03 8:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] 9
12 12 order Stipulation and Order Fri 12/03 7:48 AM
Agreed Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)11 Stipulation filed by Vernon Inge, Jr.
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 11/30 10:50 AM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Vernon Inge, Jr. and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Vernon Inge, Jr.. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Fri 11/19 10:54 PM
Notice of Motion and Notice of Hearing Related [+] filed by Erika L. Morabito of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 01:00 PM at Judge Huennekens' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5000, Richmond, Virginia.(Morabito, Erika)
Related: [-] related document(s)9 Motion to Approve filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
9 9 motion Approve Fri 11/19 10:52 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under FRBP 9019 filed by Erika L. Morabito of Quinn Emanuel on behalf of Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. (Morabito, Erika)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Thursday, November 04, 2021
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Thu 11/04 6:40 AM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)7 Stipulation filed by Vernon Inge, Jr.
Monday, November 01, 2021
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 11/01 4:32 PM
Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Vernon Inge, Jr. and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Vernon Inge, Jr.. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 10/12 9:51 AM
Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint By Vernon Inge, Jr. and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Vernon Inge, Jr.. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 09/23 4:55 PM
Stipulation Regarding Acceptance of Service of Process By Vernon Inge, Jr. and Between Plaintiff filed by Bradford F. Englander of Whiteford Taylor & Preston, L.L.P. on behalf of Vernon Inge, Jr.. (Englander, Bradford)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
4 4 summon Summons and Notice; LeClairRyan PLLC. AP cases ONLY Thu 09/09 4:45 PM
Summons and notice issued to Vernon Inge, Jr. Related [+] (Bullock, Nathaniel)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 court Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee Tue 09/07 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 119004. Fee Amount $350.00. (stehlem)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 09/03 6:55 AM
Payment Cleared on Complaint 21-03085 KRH) [cmp,cmpfee] ( 350.00) filing fee. Related [+] (Manley) Modified on 9/3/2021 (Manley, Candace)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Thursday, September 02, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Thu 09/02 10:34 PM
Adversary case 21-03085 Complaint against Vernon Inge, Jr. filed by Lynn L. Tavenner, as Chapter 7 Trustee. Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:19-bk-34574 (Nelson, Brittany)
Related: [-]