Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-17633

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:21-ap-01176
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2021
Terminated:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Select Energy Services, LLC
36 South 18th Ave., Suite D
Brighton, CO 80601
Represented By
Select Energy Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy A Million
Represented By
Timothy L Wentworth
Okin Adams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Monday, September 26, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/26 10:19 AM
Adversary Case Number 21-01176 KHT Closed. (td)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
19 19 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Fri 09/09 12:51 PM
Order Of Dismissal Related [+]. (td)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 09/09 12:52 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 21-01176 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 9/23/2022. (td)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
18 18 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/06 1:58 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of Timothy A Million Related [+]. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
17 17 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 05/24 2:11 PM
(Amended) Order on Joint Stipulation To Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines in Scheduling Order Related [+]. (rp)
Related: [-] 16 Scheduling Order
16 16 order Scheduling Order (Adversary) Tue 05/24 11:36 AM
Order On Joint Stipulation To Extend Pre-Trial Deadlines In Scheduling Order: Related [+]. Discovery due by 9/30/2022 for15 , Dispositive Motion due 10/15/2022 for15 , (cag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, May 20, 2022
15 15 motion Stipulation Fri 05/20 9:59 PM
Stipulation Between Timothy A Million, Select Energy Services, LLC and Timothy A. Million, Conflicts Trustee and Select Energy Services, LLC Re: Extension of Pretrial Deadlines Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of Timothy A Million, Select Energy Services, LLC. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
14 14 notice Notice Tue 02/22 4:20 PM
Notice Re: Service of Plaintiffs Written Discovery Requests. Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of Timothy A Million. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
13 13 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Thu 12/23 11:39 AM
7016 Scheduling Order RE: Related [+]. Discovery due by 6/30/2022 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 7/15/2022 for1 , Written Report due by 4/29/2022 for1 , (cag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
12 12 misc 7026 (f) Report Wed 12/22 11:24 AM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of Timothy A Million, Select Energy Services, LLC Related [+]. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-] 11 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Thursday, December 02, 2021
11 11 order Compliance With Rules Thu 12/02 12:05 PM
Order Regarding Compliance With Rules Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 1/3/2022 (cag)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/02 10:37 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Vikrama S. Chandrashekar on behalf of Select Energy Services, LLC Related [+]. (Chandrashekar, Vikrama)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, November 21, 2021
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/21 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/21/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, November 19, 2021
8 8 order Extend Time Fri 11/19 1:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+]. Answer due by 12/3/2021 for6 ,7 , (cag)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time (Bankruptcy)
7 7 motion Extend Time (Bankruptcy) Fri 11/19 11:00 AM
Second Motion to Extend Time Due To Other Reasons To File Responsive Pleading Filed by Vikrama S. Chandrashekar on behalf of Select Energy Services, LLC. (Chandrashekar, Vikrama)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Monday, October 18, 2021
6 6 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 10/18 2:43 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Vikrama S. Chandrashekar on behalf of Select Energy Services, LLC Related [+]. (Chandrashekar, Vikrama)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 10/18 1:53 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Vikrama S. Chandrashekar on behalf of Select Energy Services, LLC. (Chandrashekar, Vikrama)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 09/08 1:49 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Select Energy Services, LLC served on 09/03/2021 Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of Timothy A Million. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/07 11:01 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01176 KHT] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30815003. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 09/03 9:34 AM
Summons Issued on Select Energy Services, LLC Answer Due 10/4/2021. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/03 9:32 AM
Adversary case 21-01176 Complaint by Timothy A Million against Select Energy Services, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 01/3/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]