Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:19-bk-17633
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2019
Plan Confirmed:May 22, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PetroShare Corp.
9635 Maroon Cir Ste 400
Englewood, CO 80112-6149
Represented By
Trey A. Monsour
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294


1. PetroShare Corp. Files for Voluntary Reorganization Under Chapter 11 (streetinsider.com)
Submitted Thu 09/05/2019
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Sunday, November 03, 2024
804 804 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/03 9:20 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 35. Notice Date 11/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 803 Other Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
803 803 order Other Order Fri 11/01 2:35 PM
Order on Trustee's Motion for Entry of an Order Terminating BMC Group,Inc.s Retention as Claims and Noticing Agent for the Debtors Related [+]. (dmu)
Related: [-] 794 Motion
Thursday, October 31, 2024
802 802 misc Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Thu 10/31 3:22 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of John D Baumgartner Related [+]. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-] 794 Motion