Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-17633

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:21-ap-01186
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2021
Terminated:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Wellboss Company, LLC
12450 Cutten Road
Houston, TX 77066
Represented By
The Wellboss Company, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Baumgartner
Represented By
Timothy L Wentworth
Okin Adams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, February 03, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/03 8:38 AM
Adversary Case Number 21-1186 KHT Closed. (klm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
11 11 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Wed 01/19 2:08 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (klm)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/19 2:10 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 21-1186 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 2/2/2022. (klm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/18 2:48 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of John D Baumgartner Related [+]. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
9 9 order File Wed 10/20 2:05 PM
Order for Compliance with Rule 7026 Related [+]. Document due by 11/22/2021 for1 , (klm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/19 6:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jarrod Martin on behalf of The Wellboss Company, LLC Related [+]. (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
7 7 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 09/21 8:42 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint The Wellboss Company, LLC Answer Due 10/18/2021 Related [+]. (klm)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, September 20, 2021
6 6 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 09/20 5:48 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Jarrod Martin on behalf of The Wellboss Company, LLC Related [+]. (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, September 17, 2021
5 5 notice Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 09/17 8:53 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jarrod Martin on behalf of The Wellboss Company, LLC. (Martin, Jarrod)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 09/08 1:42 PM
Summons Service Executed On: The Wellboss Company, LLC served on 09/03/2021 Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of John D Baumgartner. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 09/07 11:04 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01186 KHT] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30815031. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 09/03 10:24 AM
Summons Issued on The Wellboss Company, LLC Answer Due 10/4/2021. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/03 10:24 AM
Adversary case 21-01186 Complaint by John D Baumgartner against The Wellboss Company, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 01/3/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]