Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-17633

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:21-ap-01188
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2021
Terminated:Jan 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Element Services, LLC
20207 Leola Way
Eaton, CO 80615
Represented By
Element Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
John D Baumgartner
Represented By
Timothy L Wentworth
Okin Adams LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 01/18 10:17 AM
Adversary Case Number 21-1188 KHT Closed. (klm)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 12/27 2:52 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 21-1188 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 1/14/2022. (rp)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
11 11 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Mon 11/29 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (klm)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/23 9:15 AM
Amended Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of John D Baumgartner Related [+]. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/23 9:07 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of John D Baumgartner Related [+]. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
8 8 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 10/26 9:41 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Element Services, LLC Answer Due 11/15/2021 Related [+]. (klm)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, October 25, 2021
7 7 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 10/25 4:49 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James S. Helfrich on behalf of Element Services, LLC Related [+]. (Helfrich, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, October 15, 2021
6 6 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 10/15 3:41 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Element Services, LLC Answer Due 10/25/2021 Related [+]. (klm)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Friday, October 01, 2021
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 10/01 1:12 PM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by James S. Helfrich on behalf of Element Services, LLC Related [+]. (Helfrich, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 09/08 1:44 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Element Services, LLC served on 09/03/2021 Filed by Timothy L Wentworth on behalf of John D Baumgartner. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 09/08 1:33 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01188 KHT] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30818474. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 03, 2021
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 09/03 10:47 AM
Summons Issued on Element Services, LLC Answer Due 10/4/2021. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/03 10:46 AM
Adversary case 21-01188 Complaint by John D Baumgartner against Element Services, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 01/3/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Wentworth, Timothy)
Related: [-]