Original Case: 1:08-cv-06978

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-02702
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2014
Terminated:Sep 19, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 6:53 PM EDT
Appellant
Citibank, N.A.
Represented By
Karen E. Wagner
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Matthew Brennan Rowland
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Lindsey Knapp
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Republic of Argentina
Represented By
Carmine D. Boccuzzi Jr.
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
NML Capital, Ltd.
Represented By
Theodore B. Olson
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Matthew McGill
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Jason J. Mendro
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 6:19 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 29, 2014
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1283552] 14-2702
Related: [-]
2 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 07/28/2014, RECEIVED.[1283557] 14-2702
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1283561] 14-2702
Related: [-]