3rd Rock Logistics, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 8:21-bk-01416
Lead case is: 8:21-bk-01416
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Caryl E Delano |
Case #: | 8:21-bk-04614 |
Case Filed: | Sep 03, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 21, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
3rd Rock Logistics, LLC
PO Box 15066
Sarasota, FL 34277-1066 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 09/02/2021 8:00 PM EDT |
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
crditcrd
Receipt of Filing Fee
Fri 09/03 8:14 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(8:21-bk-04614) [misc,volp11a2] (1738.00). Receipt Number 68196222, Amount Paid $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Fri 09/03 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |
||
1 | 1
![]() Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of 3rd Rock Logistics, LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 12/2/2021. (Joyner, Mary) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of Debtor 3rd Rock Logistics, LLC. (Jeffery H.) |