Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Caryl E Delano
Case #: 8:21-bk-01416
Case Filed:Mar 26, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/24/2025 3:26 PM EDT
Friday, March 26, 2021
court Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry) Fri 03/26 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 03/26 11:09 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. SubchapterV. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Incomplete, Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed or Incomplete, Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney Not Filed or Not Required, Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of David G. Hellweg. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/24/2021. (Joyner, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement About Your Social Security Numbers Fri 03/26 11:09 AM
Statement of Debtors Social Security Numbers Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of Debtor David G. Hellweg. (Joyner, Mary)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate of Credit Counseling Fri 03/26 11:09 AM
Certificate of Credit Counseling. Date Course was Completed: 02/19/2021. Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of Debtor David G. Hellweg. (Joyner, Mary)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Application to Employ/Retain Fri 03/26 3:59 PM
Application to Employ Mary A. Joyner as Counsel for Debtor Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of Debtor David G. Hellweg (Joyner, Mary)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Declaration Fri 03/26 4:02 PM
Declaration re: in Support of Debtor's Application for Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Employment of David Jennis, PA d/b/a Jennis Morse Etlinger as Counsel for the Debtor and Disclosure of Compensation Under Rules 2014 and 2016 Filed by Mary A Joyner on behalf of Debtor David G. Hellweg. (Joyner, Mary)
Related: [-]