Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51037
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2021
Terminated:Sep 10, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
4600 East Lake Boulevard
Birmingham, AL 35217
Represented By
Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Friday, September 10, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/10 9:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51037 Closed (MD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
3 3 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 09/09 2:42 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 10:09 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51037 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10482076, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 09/07 3:19 PM
Adversary case 21-51037 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/6/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives