Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51044
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Feb 11, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
3Cloud, LLC
3025 Highland Parkway Suite 525
Downers Grove, IL 60515
Represented By
3Cloud, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 24 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
18 18 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 11/30 1:37 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/30 12:41 PM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Signed on 11/30/2022 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
16 16 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Tue 11/29 4:37 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 11/29 11:00 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
14 14 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Mon 11/07 4:37 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/28/2022. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/11 6:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51044 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 10, 2022
13 13 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 02/10 2:00 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
12 12 motion Stipulation Tue 01/04 5:32 PM
Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and 3Cloud, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 11 ,1
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 12/14 10:52 AM
Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and 3Cloud, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 2:14 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:43 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:23 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 1:45 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant 3Cloud, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51044 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 12:37 PM
Adversary case 21-51044 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against 3Cloud, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives