Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51051
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Mar 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.
1111 Newton Street
Gretna, LA 70053
Represented By
Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 80 minutes ago
Friday, January 20, 2023
17 17 notice Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 01/20 2:11 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment Related [+] Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 11 ,12 ,13 ,14
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/01 10:38 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51051 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/17 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/17 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, February 14, 2022
14 14 1 pgs court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Mon 02/14 12:30 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendant Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 2/14/2022. (MD)
Related: [-] 12
13 13 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 02/14 12:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against Defendant Alere Toxicology Services, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 2/14/2022. (MD)
Related: [-] 11
Friday, February 11, 2022
12 12 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 02/11 9:05 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-] 11 11
Att: 1 Proposed Judgment by Default
11 11 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 02/11 9:02 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Entry of Default
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 13, 2022
10 10 notice Substitution of Counsel- Notice Thu 01/13 8:57 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance And Substitution of Counsel for FI Liquidating Trust Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 11:09 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 1:40 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51051 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 12:46 PM
Adversary case 21-51051 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Alere Toxicology Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives