Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51055
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Dec 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
ARC Realty, LLC
4274 Cahaba Heights Court Suite 200
Birmingham, AL 35243
Represented By
ARC Realty, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/21 10:21 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51055 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 12/20 10:39 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Service Tue 03/15 9:48 PM
Notice of Service Defendant Arc Realty, LLC's First Set of Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff Filed by ARC Realty, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 05, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Service Sat 02/05 8:59 PM
Notice of Service Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission Propounded by Plaintiff Related [+] Filed by ARC Realty, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 2:54 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
7 7 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:43 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/12 8:42 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by ARC Realty, LLC Mediation due date: 02/9/2022.(Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:23 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 1:37 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant ARC Realty, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:28 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51055 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 12:55 PM
Adversary case 21-51055 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against ARC Realty, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives