Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51062
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Dec 16, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
PRGX USA, Inc.
600 Galleria Parkway Suite 100
Atlanta, GA 30339
Represented By
PRGX USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 33 minutes ago
Friday, December 16, 2022
24 24 mediation Settled Prior to Mediation Fri 12/16 8:09 AM
Mediator's Certification After Appointment Indicating Parties Have Settled Prior to Mediation Services Being Rendered. Parties Shall File Settlement Document(s) and/or Notice of Dismissal with the Court Settlement due by: 02/14/2023. (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 12/16 11:07 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51062 Closed (DRG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
23 23 court Mediator Report Past Due Thu 12/15 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/15 2:49 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
21 21 notice Mediation - Notice Wed 09/28 3:32 PM
Notice of Mediation Notice of Scheduling of Mediation Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 08, 2022
20 20 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 07/08 11:27 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery regarding Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to PRGX USA, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
19 19 notice Notice of Service Thu 05/12 2:17 PM
Notice of Service of (I) PRGX USA Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission; and (II) PRGX USA, Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admission, First Set of Interrogatories, and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed To Plaintiff Filed by PRGX USA, Inc. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/12 2:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by PRGX USA, Inc. Mediation due date: 09/9/2022.(Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
17 17 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 05/12 2:01 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by PRGX USA, Inc. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Add Attorney Thu 05/12 2:05 PM
Attorney Matthew R. Brooks and Kenneth Listwak for PRGX USA, Inc. added to case Filed by PRGX USA, Inc.. (Listwak, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
16 16 motion Stipulation Fri 04/29 3:03 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Between FI Liquidating Trust and PRGX USA, Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 08, 2022
15 15 motion Stipulation Fri 04/08 12:55 PM
Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and PRG USA, Inc. Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint and Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
14 14 motion Stipulation Mon 03/07 4:48 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Between FI Liquidating Trust and PRGX USA, Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
13 13 motion Stipulation Fri 02/04 1:07 PM
Stipulation (Third) for Extension of TIme for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Between FI Liquidating Trust and PRG USA, Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
12 12 motion Stipulation Wed 01/12 2:50 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between FI Liquidating Trust and PRG USA, Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 12/14 11:46 AM
Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and PRGX USA, Inc. for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 3:00 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 2:00 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:49 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:35 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:54 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant PRGX USA, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51062 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 1:06 PM
Adversary case 21-51062 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against PRGX USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives