Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51063
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Jun 21, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C.
111 Oxmoor Road
Birmingham, AL 35202
Represented By
Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 06/21 11:54 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51063 Closed (DRG)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/20 9:59 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/16 12:15 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Service Thu 01/13 4:53 PM
Notice of Service Defendant's Initial Disclosures of Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7026 Filed by Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C.. (Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Thu 12/16 2:25 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production of Documents Propounded to Plaintiff Filed by Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C. (Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/14 2:22 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C. Mediation due date: 04/13/2022.(Falgowski, Justin)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 11:09 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 1:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51063 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 1:06 PM
Adversary case 21-51063 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Buffalo Rock Distribution Company, L.L.C.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives