Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51068
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:May 23, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Red River Commodities, Inc.
501 42nd Street North
Fargo, ND 58102
Represented By
Red River Commodities, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Monday, May 23, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/23 9:40 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51068 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
14 14 motion Stipulation Fri 05/20 2:32 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Between FI Liquidating Trust and Red River Commodities, Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Service Thu 12/16 3:22 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Red River Commodities, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
12 12 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 3:09 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
11 11 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Tue 11/30 11:31 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery (Defendant's Initial Disclosures and First Set of Discovery Requests Directed to Plaintiff) Filed by Red River Commodities, Inc. (Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 2:00 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
7 7 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:49 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/14 1:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Red River Commodities, Inc. Mediation due date: 02/11/2022.(Austria, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:35 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:58 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Red River Commodities, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51068 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 1:14 PM
Adversary case 21-51068 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Red River Commodities, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives