FI Liquidating Trust v. Refresco Beverages US Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-51070 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Refresco Beverages US Inc.
Corporate Center III 8112 Woodland Center Boulevard
Tampa, FL 33614 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 04/18 9:52 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51070 Closed (DMC) |
||
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Settlement Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Friday, February 18, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Between FI Liquidating Trust and Refresco Beverages US Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, January 25, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Stipulation of Extension of Time Between FI Liquidating Trust and Refresco Beverages US Inc. dba Cott Beverages Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Refresco Beverages US Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51070 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-51070 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Refresco Beverages US Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |