Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51075
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Aug 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
2 Campus Drive
Parsippany, NJ 07504
Represented By
Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 08/02 4:46 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51075 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 08/01 1:44 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/15 3:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. Mediation due date: 04/14/2022. (Lyons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, October 22, 2021
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 10/22 1:02 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Michael T. Delaney Related [+]. Order signed on 10/22/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-] 9
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 2:00 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 10/21 10:42 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael T. Delaney . Receipt Number 3684366, Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Lyons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance - Notice Thu 10/21 10:40 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. (Lyons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
misc Add Attorney Thu 10/21 10:41 AM
Attorney Michael T. Delaney and Jeffrey James Lyons for Securitas Security Services USA, Inc. added to case Filed by Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. (Lyons, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 2:26 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. Signed on 10/19/2021 (NAB) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2021 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 2:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 3:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51075 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 1:46 PM
Adversary case 21-51075 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Securitas Security Services USA, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives