Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51081
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Mar 20, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Staffmark Investment LLC
201 East Fourth Street Suite 800
Cincinnati, OH 45202
Represented By
Staffmark Investment LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Monday, March 20, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 03/20 8:36 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51081 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
19 19 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Fri 12/09 11:54 AM
Order Approving Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Related [+] Signed on 12/9/2022. (NAB)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
18 18 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 11/30 1:37 PM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
17 17 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Tue 11/29 4:37 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 11/29 11:00 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
15 15 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Mon 11/07 4:37 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for an Order Approving Settlements of Avoidance Actions Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 12/1/2022 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/28/2022. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
14 14 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 03/10 4:37 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery regarding Staffmark Investment, LLC's First Set of Requests for Admission Directed to Plaintiff, Staffmark Investment, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff and Staffmark Investment, LLC's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiff Filed by Staffmark Investment LLC (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 03/10 4:34 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery regarding Staffmark Investment, LLC's Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 Filed by Staffmark Investment LLC (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/14 12:10 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Staffmark Investment LLC Mediation due date: 06/14/2022.(Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 02/01 5:34 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between FI Liquidating Trust and Staffmark Investment LLC . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 3:17 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 2:03 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:49 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 2:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:35 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 3:09 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Staffmark Investment LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51081 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 2:09 PM
Adversary case 21-51081 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Staffmark Investment LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives