Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51091
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Oct 04, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Bazaar, Inc.
1900 N. 5th Avenue
River Grove, IL 60171
Represented By
The Bazaar, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Monday, October 04, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/04 10:48 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51091 Closed (FMo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 01, 2021
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 10/01 3:38 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
3 3 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:23 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 09/08 5:29 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51091 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483181, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 2:48 PM
Adversary case 21-51091 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against The Bazaar, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives