Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51115
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Jan 31, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Warren Oil Company, LLC
2340 US-301
Dunn, NC 28334
Represented By
Warren Oil Company, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Monday, January 31, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 01/31 12:16 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 01/31 2:54 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51115 Closed (MD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 12/20 5:58 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/15 11:08 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Warren Oil Company, LLC Mediation due date: 04/14/2022. (Jeutter, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 2:03 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:16 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 2:26 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. Signed on 10/19/2021 (NAB) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2021 (NAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 2:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:23 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 3:30 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Warren Oil Company, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51115 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 3:35 PM
Adversary case 21-51115 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Warren Oil Company, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives