FI Liquidating Trust v. Working Solutions of Memphis, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-51118 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Working Solutions of Memphis, LLC
2403 Highway 39 North
Meridian, MS 39303 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 02/02 10:03 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51118 Closed (MD) |
||
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and Working Solutions of Memphis, LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust . (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. Signed on 10/19/2021 (NAB) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/19/2021 (NAB) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Working Solutions of Memphis, LLC. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51118 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-51118 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Working Solutions of Memphis, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |