Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51120
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Mar 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Duffy Box & Recycling, Inc.
555 Wharton Circle SW
Atlanta, GA 30336
Represented By
Duffy Box & Recycling, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/02 2:49 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51120 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/18 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/18 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/17/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
15 15 court VAN-433b Default Judgment - NO Interest Tue 02/15 4:00 PM
Default Judgment against Defendant Duffy Box & Recycling, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 2/15/2022. (NR)
Related: [-] 11
14 14 court VAN-431 Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 02/15 3:49 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Duffy Box & Recycling, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 2/15/2022. (NR)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, February 14, 2022
13 13 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Mon 02/14 2:31 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Withdrawal - Notice Mon 02/14 1:01 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Entry of Default Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
11 11 motion Request for Entry of Default Judgment (Adv) Fri 02/11 9:09 AM
Request for Entry of Default Judgment Related [+] Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 10 10
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
10 10 motion Request for Entry of Default (Adv) Fri 02/11 9:08 AM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 11:09 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 1:13 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Duffy Box & Recycling, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51120 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 3:42 PM
Adversary case 21-51120 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Duffy Box & Recycling, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives