FI Liquidating Trust v. Family Four Construction Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-51127 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 06, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Family Four Construction Inc.
5125 Buchanan Highway
Buchanan, GA 30113 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 06, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 09/06 3:36 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51127 Closed (NR) |
||
Friday, September 02, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Stipulation Between Family Four Construction Inc. and Plaintiff Extending Time to Complete Fact Discovery Under the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought By Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, And 550 Of The Bankruptcy Code . Filed by Family Four Construction Inc.. (Austria, Matthew) |
|
Friday, July 08, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Service of Responses and Objections of Defendant Family Four Construction, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Admission Filed by Family Four Construction Inc. (Austria, Matthew) |
|
Monday, June 06, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Stipulation Between Family Four Construction Inc. and FI Liquidating Trust Extending Time to Complete Fact Discovery Under the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Section 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code . Filed by Family Four Construction Inc.. (Austria, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Family Four Construction, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery (Defendant's Initial Disclosures and First Set of Discovery Requests Directed to Plaintiff) Filed by Family Four Construction Inc. (Austria, Matthew) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Family Four Construction Inc. Mediation due date: 02/11/2022.(Austria, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Family Four Construction Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51127 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-51127 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Family Four Construction Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |