Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51133
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Mar 23, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
R & M Joint Venture, LLC
670 Lafayette Street
Ringgold, GA 30736
Represented By
R & M Joint Venture, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, March 23, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/23 11:09 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/23 2:56 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51133 Closed (DMC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 19, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/20 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/19/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17
Friday, March 17, 2023
17 17 court VAN-416 Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation Fri 03/17 2:50 PM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation and Setting Mediation Deadlines. Ian Connor Bifferato, Esquire is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Trial Date to be Determined. Mediation Report due by 2/20/2023. Signed on 3/17/2023. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
16 16 notice Mediation - Notice Thu 11/17 4:50 PM
Notice of Mediation Notice of Scheduling of Mediation Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, October 31, 2022
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 10/31 10:53 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO THE FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS PROPOUNDED BY PLAINTIFF Filed by R & M Joint Venture, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
14 14 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 09/30 10:55 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by R & M Joint Venture, LLC (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
13 13 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Wed 08/31 3:09 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Regarding Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 2:00 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
9 9 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 2:19 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 10/18 10:06 AM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice for Brent James Related [+] Order Signed on 10/18/2021. (NAB)
Related: [-] 5
Friday, October 15, 2021
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/15 2:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by R & M Joint Venture, LLC Mediation due date: 02/14/2022.(Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 10/15 2:04 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Brent James . Receipt Number 3721915, Filed by R & M Joint Venture, LLC. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:56 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant R & M Joint Venture, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51133 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 4:24 PM
Adversary case 21-51133 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against R & M Joint Venture, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives