Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51136
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Jul 01, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.
5241 Elmore Road
Memphis, TN 38134
Represented By
Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Friday, July 01, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/01 10:00 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51136 Closed (NR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 06/30 1:23 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 12, 2022
17 17 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 05/12 12:48 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Tue 03/15 5:23 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests fpr Admissions Directed to the Plaintiffand Filed by Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc. (Doughty, Kristi)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Service Fri 03/11 4:30 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission Propounded by the Plaintiff Filed by Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.. (Doughty, Kristi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 20, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of Service Thu 01/20 5:04 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures Filed by Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc. (Doughty, Kristi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/15 11:36 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint Filed by Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc. Mediation due date: 04/14/2022.(Doughty, Kristi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, December 13, 2021
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/13 4:32 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc. Mediation due date: 04/12/2022. (Cocke, David)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 3:43 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
7 7 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:43 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
6 6 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:48 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
5 5 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 10/15 1:35 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.. (Doughty, Kristi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:35 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:22 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51136 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 4:41 PM
Adversary case 21-51136 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Hot Graphics & Printing, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives