Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51142
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:May 23, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Mercer Health & Benefits LLC
1166 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Mercer Health & Benefits LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Monday, May 23, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Mon 05/23 11:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51142 Closed (DRG)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 05/20 2:49 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
11 11 motion Stipulation Tue 02/01 5:44 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between FI Liquidating Trust and Mercer Health & Benefits LLC . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, December 13, 2021
10 10 motion Stipulation Mon 12/13 6:22 PM
Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and Mercer Health & Benefits LLC for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Tue 10/19 2:19 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, of the Bankruptcy Code. Signed on 10/19/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:15 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:42 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Mercer Health & Benefits LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51142 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 4:49 PM
Adversary case 21-51142 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Mercer Health & Benefits LLC. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives