Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51143
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michaels Stores, Inc.
8000 Bent Branch Drive
Irving, TX 75063
Represented By
Michaels Stores, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/06 3:40 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51143 Closed (ALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/05 12:57 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal // Stipulation Between Plaintiff, FI Liquidating Trust and Defendant, Michaels Stores Inc., dba Michaels, regarding Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
18 18 court Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet Tue 10/29 2:37 PM
Hearing Held/Court Sign-In Sheet (ASA)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
17 17 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Fri 10/25 11:04 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing //Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Status Conference Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
16 16 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Adv) Tue 09/24 3:54 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing // Notice of Status Conference in Adversary Proceeding Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2024 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 05/15 4:28 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to the Honorable Craig T. Goldblatt Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice VAN-417 Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Mon 05/15 10:29 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 6/5/2023. Signed on 5/15/2023. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
13 13 misc Status Report Thu 09/01 1:47 PM
Status Report on Open Preference Adversary Action Assigned to the Honorable Craig T. Goldblatt Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
12 12 notice VAN-417 Notice and Order of Request for Status Report Wed 08/31 11:58 AM
Notice and Order of Request for Status Report with Certificate of Service. Status Report due by 9/21/2022. Signed on 8/31/2022. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
11 11 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Thu 06/16 10:51 AM
Notice of Service of Discovery Regarding Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/14 3:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Michaels Stores, Inc. Mediation due date: 04/13/2022.(Good, L. Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 9:14 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:43 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:35 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:43 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Michaels Stores, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51143 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 4:51 PM
Adversary case 21-51143 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Michaels Stores, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives