Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:21-ap-51158
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021
Terminated:Feb 09, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Loyalty Lane, Inc.
3827 Roswell Road
Marietta, GA 30062
Represented By
Loyalty Lane, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 57 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
14 14 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 02/09 12:07 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/09 2:52 PM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51158 Closed (MD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 02/01 5:03 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
12 12 motion Stipulation Fri 01/14 12:40 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Between FI Liquidating Trust and Loyalty Lane, Inc. . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
11 11 motion Stipulation Wed 12/15 10:11 AM
Stipulation Between FI Liquidating Trust and Loyalty Lane, Inc. for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to the Complaint . Filed by FI Liquidating Trust Related [+]. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 07, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Service Tue 12/07 3:48 PM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/22 10:00 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Thu 10/21 11:55 AM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/21 8:50 AM
Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 10/20 2:43 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2021
5 5 misc Certificate of No Objection(Multi) Mon 10/18 1:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
4 4 motion Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings - Motion (Adversary) Tue 09/28 11:35 AM
Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
3 3 1 pgs notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Wed 09/15 2:05 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Loyalty Lane, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, September 09, 2021
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51158 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 08, 2021
1 1 14 pgs cmp RETIRED - Complaint Wed 09/08 5:17 PM
Adversary case 21-51158 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Loyalty Lane, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 1 pgs Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives