FI Liquidating Trust v. Manthan Systems Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-11984
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Craig T Goldblatt |
Case #: | 1:21-ap-51159 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Manthan Systems Inc.
49 Stevenson Street Suite 950
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FI Liquidating Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 12/22 9:25 AM
Adversary Case 1:21-ap-51159 Closed (MD) |
||
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Dismissal Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests and Initial Disclosures Filed by FI Liquidating Trust (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Friday, October 22, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of Service of Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 25, 2021 at 10:00 A.M. (Eastern Time) Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service of the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502,547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code and the Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, October 20, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Greater Than $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code. Order signed on 10/20/2021. (DCL) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of No Objection for Plaintiffs Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for an Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Filed by FI Liquidating Trust. Objections due by 10/12/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Manthan Systems Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 09/09 8:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 21-51159 CTG] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A10483602, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-51159 Complaint by FI Liquidating Trust against Manthan Systems Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 12/7/2021. (Johnson, Ericka) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |