New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:21-cv-05055
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2021
Terminated:Apr 22, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 4:23 AM EST
Defendant
Dave A Chokshi
Represented By
Lora Minicucci
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amanda Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
City of New York
Represented By
Lora Minicucci
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amanda Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
Represented By
Lora Minicucci
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amanda Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
Represented By
Lora Minicucci
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amanda Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Meisha Porter
Represented By
Lora Minicucci
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amanda Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Bill de Blasio
Represented By
Lora Minicucci
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amanda Croushore
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Maniscalco
Represented By
Mark J. Fonte
contact info
Louis M Gelormino
Helbock, Nappa & Gallucci
contact info
Plaintiff
Evelyn Arancio
Represented By
Mark J. Fonte
contact info
Louis M Gelormino
Helbock, Nappa & Gallucci
contact info
Plaintiff
Corinne Lynch
Represented By
Mark J. Fonte
contact info
Louis M Gelormino
Helbock, Nappa & Gallucci
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana Salomon
Represented By
Mark J. Fonte
contact info
Louis M Gelormino
Helbock, Nappa & Gallucci
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, April 22, 2022
29 29 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/22 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Evelyn Arancio, Corinne Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 04/22 5:00 PM
Civil Case Terminated as per plaintiffs' Rule 41(a) notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/22/2022. (Cogan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
order Order(Other) Mon 04/18 12:42 PM
ORDER. In light of the Supreme Court's denial of plaintiffs' petition for a writ of certiorari, plaintiffs are directed to inform the Court by 04/25/2022 whether they intend to proceed with this action. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/18/2022. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
28 28 1 pgs misc Status Report Mon 02/07 2:35 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding petition to the Supreme Court by Dave A Chokshi, City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, Bill de Blasio (Minicucci, Lora)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 02, 2022
27 27 misc Transcript Sun 01/02 11:55 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 22, 2021, before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber David R Roy, Telephone number (718) 613-2609. Email address: drroyofcr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 1/23/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/2/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2022. (Roy, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
26 26 service Summons Issued Wed 12/22 11:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Dave A Chokshi, City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, Bill de Blasio. (Lee, Tiffeny)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
25 25 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 12/17 10:57 AM
Proposed Summons. by Evelyn Arancio, Corinne Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
24 24 motion Show Cause Thu 12/16 1:27 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Extension of Service by Evelyn Arancio, Corinne Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Show Cause Thu 12/16 6:13 PM
ORDER granting24 . Plaintiffs must serve defendants with a summons by 12/23/2021 or this case will be dismissed. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/16/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
23 23 misc Letter Fri 12/10 11:33 AM
Letter regarding service by Dave A Chokshi, City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, Bill de Blasio (Minicucci, Lora)
Related: [-]
order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/10 12:30 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:23 . Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by 12/17/2021 why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/10/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 11/29 7:47 PM
ORDER denying22 Motion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae without prejudice. The case has been stayed and there are no pending motions before the Court so that an amicus brief would not be useful to the Court. Amicus may renew her motion at such time as the stay is lifted and the parties have presented an issue for the Court to decide. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/29/2021. C/M (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 12, 2021
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Wed 11/17 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document for leave to file Amicus Curiae, submitted by Pritish Vora, pro se . (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
minutes Status Conference Tue 11/09 10:19 AM
Minute Entry and Order for Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/09/2021. Both sides present by telephone. The case is STAYED for the earlier of 90 days or the time that the Supreme Court of the United States rules on plaintiffs' petition for a writ of certiorari. The parties are directed to file a status report within 90 days or at such earlier time, if any, as the Supreme Court rules on the petition. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 05, 2021
21 21 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 11/05 9:35 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by Evelyn Arancio, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon, Corinne Lynch. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that, for substantially the reasons stated in the District Courts thoughtful memorandum decision of September 23, 2021, the order entered on that date, in which the District Court denied plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction, is AFFIRMED. The case is remanded and shall proceed as the District Court deems necessary or advisable. Issued as Mandate: 11/5/2021. USCA# 21-2343 (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 11/05 11:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a telephonic status conference on 11/9/2021 at 10:00 AM. Parties will use toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 5055#. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/5/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
20 20 appeal USCA Order Fri 10/15 4:37 PM
ORDER of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by Evelyn Arancio, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon, Corinne Lynch. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that for substantially the reasons stated in the District Courts thoughtful memorandum decision of September 23, 2021, the order entered on that date, in which the District Court denied plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction, is AFFIRMED. The case is remanded and shall proceed as the District Court deems necessary or advisable. Certified Copy Issued: 10/15/2021. USCA# 21-2343 (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
19 19 appeal USCA Order Mon 09/27 8:32 PM
ORDER of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by Evelyn Arancio, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon, Corinne Lynch. This Court entered a temporary injunction in the above-captioned case on Friday, September 24, 2021 for administrative purposes pending decision by a three- Judge panel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the September 24 injunction is DISSOLVED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for an injunction pending appeal is DENIED. Certified Copy Issued: 9/27/2021. USCA# 21-2343 (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 24, 2021
18 18 appeal USCA Order Fri 09/24 6:11 PM
ORDER of USCA as to17 Notice of Appeal filed by Evelyn Arancio, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon, Corinne Lynch. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, to the extent Appellants seek a temporary injunction pending review of their motion by a three-judge panel, that request is GRANTED. The request for an injunction pending appeal is REFERRED to a three-judge motions panel on an expedited basis. Certified Copy Issued: 9/24/2021. USCA# 21-2343 (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
appeal Electronic Index to Record on Appeal Fri 09/24 7:41 AM
Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals.17 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 09/23 10:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause by Evelyn Arancio, Corinne Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14868069. Appeal Record due by 10/25/2021. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Show Cause Thu 09/23 9:30 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying2 Motion for preliminary injunction. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/23/2021. (Cogan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
15 15 misc Letter Wed 09/22 5:39 PM
Letter by Dave A Chokshi, City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, Bill de Blasio (Croushore, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Order
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/22 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis M Gelormino on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Gelormino, Louis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
13 13 misc Letter Tue 09/21 2:49 PM
Letter Re: Notice of Publicly Available Facts by Evelyn Arancio, Corinne Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
12 12 respoth Reply in Support Mon 09/20 6:27 PM
REPLY in Support re2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Evelyn Arancio, Corinne Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco, Diana Salomon. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/20 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Croushore on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Croushore, Amanda)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/20 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lora Minicucci on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Minicucci, Lora)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
order Scheduling Order Fri 09/17 2:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Argument on the motion will be held on 9/22/2021 at 2:30 PM by video. Counsel of record are directed to use the Zoom video link that will be sent by email at a later time. Public audio access is available by calling the toll-free number 888-684-8852 and access code 6427877#. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/17/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
9 9 25 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Thu 09/16 4:53 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Minicucci, Lora)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - COH order 8/24/21,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - COH order 9/15/21,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Impact Arbitration Decision,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Wall Street Journal Article,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - US New Article,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - AAP State Level Data,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - CDC Antibody Information
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 09/15 10:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rachel Maniscalco, Evelyn Arancio, Diana Salomon, Corinne Lynch. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
7 7 motion Amend/Correct/Supplement Tue 09/14 5:20 PM
Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Complaint by Rachel Maniscalco. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Tue 09/14 5:56 PM
ORDER denying7 Motion as unnecessary. The Court did not have to grant plaintiff the right to file an amended complaint because Rule 15(a) already grants plaintiff that right. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/14/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 10, 2021
6 6 motion Adjourn Conference Fri 09/10 4:04 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference on the Emergency Motion by Rachel Maniscalco. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 09/10 10:50 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 09/10 10:48 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 09/10 10:44 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Rachel Maniscalco (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Show Cause Fri 09/10 10:03 AM
Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Rachel Maniscalco. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER,
Att: 2 Declaration RACHEL MANISCALCO,
Att: 3 Declaration LOUIS GELORMINO
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/10 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Dave A Chokshi, City of New York, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education, Meisha Porter, Bill de Blasio filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14824812 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Rachel Maniscalco. (Fonte, Mark)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/10 10:47 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Fri 09/10 12:04 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A hearing on the emergency motion for a temporary restraining order is scheduled for 9/13/2021 at 2:00 PM by video. Plaintiff must provide notice to defendants and attempt to secure their appearance at the hearing. A video link will be emailed to counsel of record. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/10/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 09/10 5:14 PM
ORDER granting in part6 . The conference on 9/13/2021 is canceled, and the proposed briefing schedule (defendants' opposition 9/16 and plaintiff's reply 9/20) is approved. The Court will likely conduct a video hearing on 9/22 or 9/23, but the day and time of the hearing will not be set until the Court reviews defendants' opposition and the parties have advised the Court how long they anticipate the hearing will take and whether it will be evidentiary. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/10/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy)
Related: [-]