Original Case: 1:21-cv-05055

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv-02343
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2021
Terminated:Oct 15, 2021
Last checked: Monday Oct 18, 2021 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
New York City Department of Education
Represented By
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Devin Slack
New York City Law Department
contact info
Susan Paulson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Meisha Porter, in her official capacity as Schools Chancellor of the New York City Department of Education
Represented By
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Devin Slack
New York City Law Department
contact info
Susan Paulson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
City of New York
Represented By
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Devin Slack
New York City Law Department
contact info
Susan Paulson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Bill de Blasio
Represented By
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Devin Slack
New York City Law Department
contact info
Susan Paulson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
Represented By
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Devin Slack
New York City Law Department
contact info
Susan Paulson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Dave A. Chokshi, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene
Represented By
Richard Paul Dearing
New York City Law Department
contact info
Devin Slack
New York City Law Department
contact info
Susan Paulson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Rachel Maniscalco
Represented By
Louis Gelormino
Louis Gelormino, Esq.
contact info
Mark J. Fonte
Mark J. Fonte, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Evelyn Arancio
Represented By
Louis Gelormino
Louis Gelormino, Esq.
contact info
Mark J. Fonte
Mark J. Fonte, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Diana Salomon
Represented By
Louis Gelormino
Louis Gelormino, Esq.
contact info
Mark J. Fonte
Mark J. Fonte, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Corine Lynch
Represented By
Louis Gelormino
Louis Gelormino, Esq.
contact info
Mark J. Fonte
Mark J. Fonte, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/18/2021 4:30 AM EDT
Friday, September 24, 2021
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Evelyn Arancio, Corine Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco and Diana Salomon, FILED. [3179767] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:51 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 6 pgs Case FILED
2 2 12 pgs DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER, dated 09/23/2021, RECEIVED.[3179775] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:55 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Evelyn Arancio, Corine Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco and Diana Salomon, district court receipt # ANYEDC-14868069, FILED.[3179779] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 10:56 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3179792] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 11:00 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 5 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Dave A. Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 09/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3179974] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 12:32 PM]
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY, Susan Paulson, [5], in place of attorney Georgia M. Pestana, SUBSTITUTED.[3180005] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 12:43 PM]
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Dave A. Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 09/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3180063] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 01:01 PM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY, Devin Slack for City of New York Meisha Porter Dave A. Chokshi Bill de Blasio Department of Health and Mental Hygiene New York City Department of Education, in case 21-2343 [7], ADDED.[3180253] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 02:00 PM]
Related: [-]
9 9 30+ pgs MOTION, for injunction, on behalf of Appellant Evelyn Arancio, Corine Lynch, Rachel Maniscalco and Diana Salomon, FILED. Service date 09/24/2021 by CM/ECF.[3180655] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 03:58 PM]
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for injunction [9], on behalf of Appellee Dave A. Chokshi, City of New York, Bill de Blasio, Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, New York City Department of Education and Meisha Porter, FILED. Service date 09/24/2021 by CM/ECF. [3180755] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:04 PM]
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, to the extent Appellants seek a temporary injunction pending review of their motion by a three-judge panel, that request is GRANTED. The request for an injunction pending appeal is REFERRED to a three-judge motions panel on an expedited basis. [9] by JFB, FILED. [3180810][16] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 05:58 PM]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/24/2021, to EDNY, ISSUED.[3180811] 21-2343 [Entered: 09/24/2021 06:02 PM]
Related: [-]