New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kyu Young Paek
Case #: 7:21-bk-22521
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2021
Creditor Meeting:Oct 14, 2021

Debtor
Fun Bowl Vacations, Inc.
c/o Koplen Law Firm, 14 S. Main Street
New City, NY 10956
Represented By
Michael A. Koplen
Law Offices
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Marianne T. O'Toole
Marianne T. O'Toole, As Trustee 2 Depot Plaza Suite 2 E
Bedford Hills, NY 10507
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


Docket last updated: 09/13/2021 12:02 PM EDT
Monday, September 13, 2021
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 09/13 11:20 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 21-22521 ) [misc,969] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15493312. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Set Deficiency Deadlines Mon 09/13 11:29 AM
Deficiencies Set: Section 521(i) Incomplete Filing Date: 10/28/2021. Statement of Intention due 9/27/2021. Corporate Resolution due 9/27/2021. Incomplete Filings due by 9/27/2021, (Walker, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Mon 09/13 11:18 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Michael A. Koplen of Law Offices on behalf of Fun Bowl Vacations, Inc.. (Koplen, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 7 Corporation or Partnership) (BNC) Mon 09/13 11:30 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/14/2021 at 09:30 AM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY). (Walker, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Mon 09/13 11:32 AM
Corporate Resolution Pursuant to LR 1074-1 Filed by Michael A. Koplen on behalf of Fun Bowl Vacations, Inc.. (Koplen, Michael)
Related: [-]