Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:21-bk-22521

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:23-ap-07026
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Linda Heinemann
4 Albert Court
Congers, NY 10920
Represented By
Linda Heinemann
contact info
Defendant
Myrna Raboy
2 Albert Court
Congers, NY 10920
Represented By
Myrna Raboy
contact info
Defendant
Josephine Mundy
37 Harbor Pointe Drive
Haverstraw, NY 10927
Represented By
Josephine Mundy
contact info
Plaintiff
Marianne T. O'Toole, as Trustee of the Estate of Fun Bowl Vacations, Inc., Debtor
2 Depot Plaza Suite 2E
Bedford Hills, NY 10507
Represented By
William F. Macreery
contact info

GPO Jan 06 2025
Memorandum Decision Granting In Part And Denying In Part The Trustees Motion For Summary Judgment Signed On 1/6/2025. (Kinchen, Gwen). Related document(s) 8
GPO Jan 06 2025
DUPLICATE Memorandum Decision Granting In Part and Denying in Part the Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment signed on 1/6/2025. (related document(s)8) (DuBois, Linda) Modified on 1/6/2025 (Kinchen, Gwen).

Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
42 42 misc Letter Tue 04/22 4:46 PM
Letter to Court Confirming Adjournment of Status Conference from April 24, 2025 to May 22, 2025 at 10:00 A.M. Filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Tue 04/22 1:44 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Status Conference; hearing not held and adjourned to 05/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (VanessaAshmeade)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
40 40 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 03/27 11:32 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Status Conference held and adjourned to 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
39 39 misc Letter Thu 02/27 6:41 PM
Letter to Counsel for the Defendants Regarding the Adjourned Status Conference Filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 02/27 11:52 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing re: Status Conference held and adjourned to 3/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
37 37 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 02/19 9:53 AM
Notice of Hearing setting Status Conference filed by Clerk of Court, United States Bankruptcy Court, SDNY. with hearing to be held on 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Letter Wed 02/19 9:01 AM
Letter to the Court Requesting Status Conference Filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
35 35 order Motion, Summary Judgment Tue 01/21 11:31 AM
Order Granting in part, Denying in part Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] signed on 1/21/2025. (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
34 34 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/15 2:00 PM
Certificate of Service of the Notice of Submission of Order on the Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF Doc. No. 33] together with the proposed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Trustees Motion for Summary Judgment and the Memorandum Decision on which it is based [ECF Doc. No. 30] Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 33
33 33 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 01/15 11:37 AM
Notice of Proposed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with presentment to be held on 1/21/2025 (check with court for location)(Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 30
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part the Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Memorandum Decision
Monday, January 06, 2025
32 32 court CHAP Minute Entry - Terminate Pending Deadlines Mon 01/06 1:57 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Related [+]; hearing not held, stricken moot, see doc. 30 for order. (VanessaAshmeade)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marianne T. O'Toole
31 31 22 pgs order Written Opinion Mon 01/06 11:12 AM
DUPLICATE Memorandum Decision Granting In Part and Denying in Part the Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment signed on 1/6/2025. Related [+] (DuBois, Linda) Modified on 1/6/2025 (Kinchen, Gwen)
Related: [-] 8
30 30 22 pgs order Written Opinion Mon 01/06 11:11 AM
Memorandum Decision Granting In Part And Denying In Part The Trustees Motion For Summary Judgment Signed On 1/6/2025. (Kinchen, Gwen). Related document(s)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
29 29 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 12/05 4:33 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Reply to Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole; hearing held and adjourned for record purposes only to 01/28/2025 at 07:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (VanessaAshmeade)
Related: [-] 8
28 28 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 12/05 4:32 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marianne T. O'Toole; hearing not held and adjourned for record purposes only to 01/28/2025 at 07:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (VanessaAshmeade
Thursday, November 21, 2024
27 27 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 11/21 10:46 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Reply to Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole; hearing held and adjourned for record purposes only to 12/10/2024 at 07:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 8
26 26 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 11/21 10:44 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Tool Related [+]; hearing held, motion to be take under advisement; adjourned for record purposes only to 12/10/2024 at 07:30 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 8
Monday, November 18, 2024
25 25 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/18 4:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of the Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
24 24 answer Reply Mon 11/18 2:39 PM
Reply to Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, October 18, 2024
23 23 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Fri 10/18 1:20 PM
Disregard Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Related [+]
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Adjournment of Hearing; hearing not held and adjourned to 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (VanessaAshmeade) Modified on 10/21/2024 (Fredericks, Frances)
22 22 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 10/18 9:03 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and the Defendants' Opposition to the Motion Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with hearing to be held on 11/21/2024 (check with court for location) (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, October 17, 2024
21 21 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 10/17 5:03 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Opposition Related [+] filed by Michael A. Koplen on behalf of Linda Heinemann, Josephine Mundy, Myrna Rab; hearing not held and adjourned to 11/14/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (PB) (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-] 8
20 20 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 10/17 4:51 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing RE: Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marianne T. O'Toole; hearing not held and adjourned to 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (VanessaAshmeade
Sunday, September 29, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Sun 09/29 11:43 AM
Letter Filed by Michael A. Koplen on behalf of Linda Heinemann, Josephine Mundy, Myrna Raboy. (Koplen, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 answer Affidavit Sun 09/29 10:59 AM
Affidavit Related [+] filed by Michael A. Koplen on behalf of Linda Heinemann, Josephine Mundy, Myrna Raboy. (Koplen, Michael)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 answer Opposition Fri 09/27 5:05 PM
Opposition Related [+] filed by Michael A. Koplen on behalf of Linda Heinemann, Josephine Mundy, Myrna Raboy. (Koplen, Michael)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 misc Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Thu 09/05 7:17 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Re: Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole Related [+]. September 25, 2024 hearing not held, matter adjourned to 10/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) - See Document #13 (Fredericks, Frances)
Related: [-] 8
Friday, August 30, 2024
14 14 court CHAP Minute Entry - Terminate Pending Deadlines Fri 08/30 9:59 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Related [+]; hearing not held, stricken moot; Attorney to File Amended Notice of Hearing. (VanessaAshmeade)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Marianne T. O'Toole
Friday, August 23, 2024
16 16 notice ~Generic~ NOTICE Fri 09/06 1:40 PM
Notice of Address Correction Requested by Defendant Josephine Mundy (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
13 13 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 08/20 12:55 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Plaintiff-Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with hearing to be held on 10/22/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (KYP) (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, August 01, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing - Case Reassignment Notice Fri 08/02 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Case Reassignment Related [+] . Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #11 )
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
11 11 misc Case Reassignment Notice (BNC) Tue 07/30 10:09 AM
Notice of Case Reassignment From Judge Sean H. Lane to Judge Kyu Young Paek. Judge Kyu Young Paek added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/11 7:39 AM
Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing and Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 9 ,8
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
9 9 notice Notice, Hearing Tue 07/09 1:31 PM
Notice of Hearing Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with hearing to be held on 9/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Objections due by 9/18/2024, (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 8
8 8 motion Motion, Summary Judgment Tue 07/09 1:20 PM
Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole with hearing to be held on 9/25/2024 at 02:00 PM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) Responses due by 9/18/2024,. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 7056-1 In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Att: 2 Affirmation of William F. Macreery, Esq.
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Macreery Affirmation - Voluntary Petition
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 to Macreery Affirmation 2004 Order
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 to Macreery Affirmation Mundy Deposition
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 to Macreery Affirmation Raboy Deposition
Att: 7 Exhibit 5 to Macreery Affirmation Heinemann
Att: 8 Exhibit 6 to Macreery Affirmation Bowling Leagues Ledger
Att: 9 Exhibit 7 to Macreery Affirmation Bowling League Contracts
Att: 10 Exhibit 8 to Macreery Affirmation Installment Payment Ledger
Att: 11 Exhibit 9 to Macreery Affirmation Fun Bowl Chase Statements Acc1052
Att: 12 Exhibit 10 to Macreery Affirmation Fun Bowl Chase Statements Acc 2565
Att: 13 Exhibit 11 to Macreery Affirmation Fun Bowl 2019 Returns
Att: 14 Exhibit 12 to Macreery Affirmation Fun Bowl 2020 Return
Att: 15 Exhibit 13 to Macreery Affirmation Fun Bowl 2021 Return
Att: 16 Exhibit 14 to Macreery Affirmation Henemann 2021 Return Redacted
Att: 17 Exhibit 15 to Macreery Affirmation Mundy Return Redacted
Att: 18 Exhibit 16 to Macreery Affirmation Mundy 2021 Returns Redacted
Att: 19 Exhibit 17 to Macreery Affirmation Answer filed in Main Case
Att: 20 Exhibit 18 to Macreery Affirmation Adversary Complaint
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Tue 01/09 1:12 PM
Letter to the Court Requesting Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment in this Adversary Proceeding Filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
6 6 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/26 1:25 PM
Scheduling And Pre-Trial Order Signed On 10/26/2023. With hearing to be held on 1/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Ebanks, Liza)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
5 5 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Tue 09/12 3:39 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing and Pretrial Conference filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with hearing to be held on 10/10/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
4 4 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Wed 08/23 1:06 PM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing and Pretrial Conference filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with hearing to be held on 9/26/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL) (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/04 1:19 PM
Certificate of Service of the Summons with Notice of Pretrial Conference and Complaint on All Defendants Related [+] filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Monday, July 31, 2023
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Mon 07/31 11:37 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (SHL), Answer due by 8/30/2023, (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 07/24 5:09 PM
Adversary case 23-07026 Complaint against Linda Heinemann, Myrna Raboy, Josephine Mundy to Avoid and Recover Fraudulent or Preferential Transfers (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by William F. Macreery on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Macreery, William)
Related: [-]