Jeremy Chapman et al v. Ford Motor Company
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
Lead case: 2:18-ml-02814
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Pedro V Castillo |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-07083 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 02, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Wisconsin Eastern, 2:21-cv-00794 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 01, 2022 1:04 AM PST |
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Chapman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Pilof
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Kemoy Fong
Terminated: 08/10/2021
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 12/01 3:14 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Appearance
Thu 09/08 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
transfer
MDL - Letter to Counsel (CV 119) - optional html form
Mon 09/13 2:52 PM
Letter to Counsel regarding MDL Transfer-In. (ghap) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 09/13 2:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In from other District (Electronic Transfer)
Mon 09/13 2:22 PM
ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Wisconsin Eastern |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
9 | 9 Certified Order to Transfer Case to Central District of California on 9/2/2021.(cc: all counsel)(bx) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
Case Electronically Transmitted to the Central District of California on 9/8/2021. (bx) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Thursday, September 02, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
mdlcmp
Copy of Transfer Order/Conditional Transfer Order received
Mon 09/13 2:41 PM
Copy of Conditional Transfer Order - 61 received from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Transfer order filed by MDL panel on 9/2/2021 regarding transfer of Case No. 2:21-cv-00794-JPS from Eastern District of Wisconsin (Milwaukee). Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for the purpose of pretrial proceedings. Case consolidated with 2:18-ml-2814-AB-PVCx. (ghap) |
|
Tuesday, August 31, 2021 | ||
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/29/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge J P Stadtmueller. The court will initiate the call. No later than 12:00 PM the day prior to the hearing, counsel shall notify chambers at 414-297-1122 of the direct telephone number at which they may be reached. (cc: all counsel) (LD) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Wednesday, August 18, 2021 | ||
Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Tuesday, August 17, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ford Motor Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rajkumar, Roshan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 21 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . (kah) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Monday, August 16, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jeremy Chapman, Paul Pilof. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chester, Anthony) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
6 | 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Ford Motor Company. (Rajkumar, Roshan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Roshan N Rajkumar on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Roshan N. Rajkumar (Rajkumar, Roshan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
4 | 4 ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Rajkumar, Roshan) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFFS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries be filed within 14 days; the form is available[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (kah) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Tuesday, August 10, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kemoy Fong. (Chester, Anthony) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR. CASE NOT TERMINATED. Case Terminated pursuant to 3 Notice. (amb) Modified on 8/11/2021 (amb). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (amb) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | ||
Thursday, July 22, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Jeremy Chapman, Kemoy Fong, Paul Pilof (Chester, Anthony) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
Friday, June 25, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Jeremy Chapman, Paul Pilof, Kemoy Fong. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3854427)(Chester, Anthony) (jcl). [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] | |
Att: 1 (6/25/2021) Civil Cover Sheet | ||
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 9/13/2021.] |