Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Kathleen M Williams
Referred: Chris M Mcaliley
Case #: 1:21-cv-23342
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2021
Terminated:Feb 01, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 15, 2022 5:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Allison Ault
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Miami-Dade County
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Jerome Weldon
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Captain Artis West
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Jacqueline F. Beaz
Represented By
Max Richard Price, Jr.
Law Offices Of Max R. Price, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Diana B. Cluff
Represented By
Max Richard Price, Jr.
Law Offices Of Max R. Price, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
31 31 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 12/08 4:25 PM
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy). AFFIRMED Order of the district court with USCA court's opinion re26 Notice of Appeal, filed by Diana B. Cluff, Jacqueline F. Beaz; Date Issued: 12/7/2022; USCA Case Number: 22-10704 AA. (apz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
appeal Electronic Availability of ROA Tue 05/31 2:45 PM
Pursuant to 11th Cir. R. 11-2 and 11th Cir. R. 11-3, the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Florida certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re:26 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 22-10704 AA. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (hh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 17, 2022
29 29 appeal Transcript Information Form - Attorney Thu 03/17 6:37 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Jacqueline F. Beaz, Diana B. Cluff re26 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Price, Max)
Related: [-]
28 28 appeal Transcript Information Form - Attorney Thu 03/17 4:49 PM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Jacqueline F. Beaz, Diana B. Cluff re26 Notice of Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Price, Max)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
27 27 appeal Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA Tue 03/08 11:44 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re26 Notice of Appeal, filed by Diana B. Cluff, Jacqueline F. Beaz. Date received by USCA: 3/4/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-10704 AA. (apz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 03/04 8:07 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re26 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
26 26 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/03 4:09 PM
Notice of Appeal as to22 Order Remanding Case to State Court, by Jacqueline F. Beaz, Diana B. Cluff. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15446603. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information.(Price, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit FINAL ORDER BEING APPEALED
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
25 25 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Tue 02/15 4:05 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to23 Transmittal Letter Sent (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 04, 2022
24 24 appeal USCA Order Fri 02/04 3:44 PM
ORDER of Dismissal of USCA: Pursuant to Appellants Allison Ault, Jerome Weldon and Artis West's motion for voluntary dismissal, this appeal was dismissed on February 4, 2022 as to19 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Allison Ault, Jerome Weldon, Artis West, USCA # 22-10169 JJ (hh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
23 23 misc Transmittal Letter Sent to State Court - FORM Wed 02/02 9:34 AM
Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified Copy of Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: 2021-016314-CA-01 (ls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
22 22 17 pgs order Order Remanding Case to State Court Tue 02/01 1:20 PM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss10 . The Clerk is directed to remand the case to state court and close the case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/1/2022. See attached document for full details. (nlf)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
21 21 appeal Acknowledgment of Receipt from USCA Mon 01/24 9:25 AM
Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re19 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Allison Ault, Jerome Weldon, Artis West. Date received by USCA: 1/14/2022. USCA Case Number: 22-10169 JJ. (apz)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 14, 2022
20 20 appeal Transcript Information Form - Attorney Fri 01/14 11:56 AM
TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Allison Ault, Jerome Weldon, Artis West re19 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,,. No Transcript Requested. (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
19 19 appeal Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory Fri 01/14 11:52 AM
Notice of Interlocutory Appeal as to 18 Order on Motion to Stay, by Allison Ault, Jerome Weldon, Artis West. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15318983. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information.(Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 01/14 12:54 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re19 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 12/15 11:52 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Case Pending Ruling on the Motion to Dismiss11 . The motion11 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART . This matter is STAYED until January 31, 2022. The Parties must file a proposed joint revised scheduling report by February 1, 2022 , regardless of the status of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/15/2021. (nlf)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 19, 2021
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/19 7:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West. (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/10 10:10 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to10 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West.(Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 11/10 6:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time15 is GRANTED . Defendants filed their Motion for Extension of Time in compliance with the procedures detailed in the Court's Scheduling Order9 , and requested a brief extension. Defendants shall reply to Plaintiffs' response14 to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss10 by no later than November 19, 2021 . Replies due by 11/19/2021. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/10/2021. (nlf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/09 10:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OPPOSITION filed by Jacqueline F. Beaz, Diana B. Cluff. Replies due by 11/16/2021. (Price, Max)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 02, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 11/02 12:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Extension12 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART . Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss10 by no later than November 9, 2021 . The Motion For Extension filed by the Plaintiffs 12 failed to comply with this Court's practices and procedures, which state that "[a]bsent an emergency, requests for extensions of time must be presented to the Court, by motion, no later than 48 hours prior to the deadline from which the Parties are seeking relief. Sanctions may be imposed for non-emergent requests made less than 48 hours prior to the deadline." Going forward, all motions and filings by the Parties must comply fully with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, and the Practices and Procedures of this Court. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/2/2021. (clu)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 10/29 5:11 PM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to10 MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jacqueline F. Beaz, Diana B. Cluff.(Price, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
11 11 motion Stay Tue 10/19 12:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling on 10 Motion to Dismiss by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
10 10 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 10/14 7:29 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West. Responses due by 10/28/2021 (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 06, 2021
9 9 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation Thu 10/07 8:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 11/7/2022 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Calendar Call set for 11/1/2022 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
8 8 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 10/04 2:21 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/29 3:08 PM
NOTICE by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West re4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other (Notice of Filing State Court Record) (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit
6 6 misc Status Report Wed 09/29 2:42 PM
STATUS REPORT (REMOVAL STATUS REPORT) by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West (Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 20, 2021
4 4 7 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Mon 09/20 10:52 AM
ORDER Of Referral And Notice Of Court Practice In Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 9/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 09/20 11:23 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint no later than October 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/20/2021. (rr00)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2021
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 09/17 12:57 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade County, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Jerome Weldon, Artis West.(Vosseler, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, September 16, 2021
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) Thu 09/16 2:03 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15016289, filed by Allison Ault, Miami-Dade Fire Rescue Department, Miami-Dade County, Jerome Weldon, Artis West. No Answer and/or Motion to Dismiss Filed.(Vosseler, Zachary) Modified on 9/16/2021 (jao)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Defendants' papers filed in state court,
Att: 5 Other documents filed in state court
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 09/16 3:33 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
Related: [-]