Original Case: 1:21-cv-23342

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-prici-10704
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 09, 2022 3:18 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, Stephen P. Clark Center
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MIAMI-DADE FIRE RESCUE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CAPTAIN ARTIS WEST
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALLISON AULT
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEROME WELDON
Represented By
Zachary Edward Vosseler
Miami-Dade County Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DIANA B. CLUFF, Individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Gustavo Beaz
Represented By
Max Richard Price Jr.
Law Offices of Max R. Price, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JACQUELINE F. BEAZ, Individually
Represented By
Max Richard Price Jr.
Law Offices of Max R. Price, PA
contact info

GPO Nov 08 2022
Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Diana B. Cluff. Decision: Affirmed. Opinion type: Non-Published. Opinion method: Per Curiam. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions.

Docket last updated: 03/09/2022 3:18 AM EST
Friday, March 04, 2022
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Jacqueline F. Beaz and Diana B. Cluff on 03/03/2022. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 04/13/2022. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 03/22/2022 as to Appellant Diana B. Cluff. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/05/2022 as to Appellee Miami-Dade County
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 23 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 17 pgs USDC Order DE 22