ACF FINCO I, LP v. WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-12814
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:21-ap-01157 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Sep 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 13, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC
958 EL SOBRANTE RD
CORONA, CA 92879 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ACF FINCO I, LP
7251 AMIGO ST, STE 210 ATTN: TALITHA GRAY KOZLOWSKI/GARRETT NYE
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/13 2:34 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (cly) |
|
Monday, June 13, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Stipulated/Agreed Order, Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) (cly) |
|
Friday, June 10, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Stipulation By ACF FINCO I, LP and Between West Coast Equipment LLC Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceeding and Vacating All Hearings Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 02/25 11:59 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Thursday, February 24, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Continued Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 10/06/2022 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
![]() BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/03/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order Approving Verified Petition (cly) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by JEANETTE E. MCPHERSON on behalf of WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC (MCPHERSON, JEANETTE) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Document Corporate Disclosure Statement Of Defendant West Coast Equipment, LLC Filed by JEANETTE E. MCPHERSON on behalf of WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC (MCPHERSON, JEANETTE) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Answer to Complaint Answer And Affirmative Defenses Of Defendant West Coast Equipment, LLC To Complaint Filed by JEANETTE E. MCPHERSON on behalf of WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC (MCPHERSON, JEANETTE) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Designation of Local Counsel And Consent Thereto Filed by JEANETTE E. MCPHERSON on behalf of WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC (MCPHERSON, JEANETTE) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 12/14/2021 Filed by JEANETTE E. MCPHERSON on behalf of WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC (MCPHERSON, JEANETTE) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Tue 11/30 3:33 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice([LINK 21-01157 mkn] ) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20463697, fee amount $ 250.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Thursday, October 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Tuesday, October 19, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Tue 10/19 11:15 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/10/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Hearing Notice of Continued Scheduling Conference Hearing Date: 03/10/2022 Hearing Time: 10:00 a.m. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Wednesday, October 13, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Corporate Ownership Statement PLAINTIFF ACF FINCO I, LPS CORPORATE OWNERSHIP STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 7007.1 AND LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity PLAINTIFF ACF FINCO I, LPS CORPORATE OWNERSHIP STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. BANKR. P. 7007.1 AND LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Summons Service Executed on WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC 9/20/2021 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued on WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC (cly) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference)
Fri 09/17 11:43 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/27/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (cly) |
|
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 09/16 12:06 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I, LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 09/16 12:04 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint 21-01157 mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number 20358508, fee amount $ 350.00 (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 21-01157 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547 and 550 Filed by ACF FINCO I, LP vs. WEST COAST EQUIPMENT LLC Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA) |