New York Southern District Court
Judge:Alvin K Hellerstein
Case #: 1:21-cv-07922
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 22, 2021
Re-opened:May 23, 2023
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2022 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Apollo Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
James J. Pastore, Jr
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant
MidCap FinCo Designated Activity Company
Represented By
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
James J. Pastore, Jr
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Midcap Financial Services Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
James J. Pastore, Jr
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Midcap Financial Services, LLC
Represented By
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
James J. Pastore, Jr
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Midcap Financial Trust
Represented By
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
James J. Pastore, Jr
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MidCap Business Credit, LLC
Represented By
Bryan Jacob Wolin
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Lisa Pearson
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
149 149 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/13 3:12 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE : The Court administratively dismissed this action on November 21, 2024. (ECF 145.) Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all parties to this action, by and through undersigned counsel, jointly stipulate to dismissal with prejudice of all claims and counterclaims, with each party to bear its own costs and fees. So Ordered., (Apollo Global Management, Inc., Apollo Investment Administration, LLC, Apollo Investment Management, L.P., Does 1-100, MidCap Business Credit, LLC, MidCap Credit & Capital, LLC, MidCap Equipment Finance, LLC, MidCap FinCo Designated Activity Company, MidCap FinCo Holdings Limited, MidCap Financial Investment Corporation, MidCap Management, LLC, MidCap Media Finance, LLC, MidCap Trade Finance, LLC, Midcap Financial Services Capital Management, LLC, Midcap Financial Services, LLC, Midcap Financial Trust pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/13/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Voluntary Dismissal Mon 01/13 8:52 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 148 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was reviewed and referred to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (tp)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
148 148 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/10 1:28 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Apollo Capital Management, L.P., Apollo Global Management, Inc., Apollo Investment Administration, LLC, Apollo Investment Management, L.P., MidCap FinCo Designated Activity Company, MidCap FinCo Holdings Limited, MidCap Financial Investment Corporation, Midcap Financial Services Capital Management, LLC, Midcap Financial Services, LLC, Midcap Financial Trust pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by MidCap Equipment Finance, LLC, MidCap Business Credit, LLC, MidCap Management, LLC, MidCap Media Finance, LLC, MidCap Trade Finance, LLC, MidCap Credit & Capital, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Wolin, Bryan)
Related: [-]