Original Case: 1:21-cv-07922

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-00713
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2022
Terminated:Nov 23, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Nov 24, 2022 3:34 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
Midcap Financial Trust
Represented By
James J. Pastore Jr.
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Midcap Financial Services, LLC
Represented By
James J. Pastore Jr.
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Midcap Financial Services Capital Management, LLC
Represented By
James J. Pastore Jr.
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MidCap FinCo Designated Activity Company
Represented By
James J. Pastore Jr.
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Apollo Capital Management, L.P.
Represented By
James J. Pastore Jr.
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Jared I. Kagan
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MidCap Business Credit, LLC
Represented By
Lisa Pearson
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Kurtis George Anderson
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Adam Howard Charnes
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/24/2022 3:31 AM EST
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant MidCap Business Credit, LLC, FILED. [3292307] [22-713] [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:41 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 7 pgs Case FILED
2 2 25 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER AND OPINION, dated 03/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3292311] [22-713] [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:45 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/08/2022, RECEIVED.[3292312] [22-713] [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:45 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant MidCap Business Credit, LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-25955933, FILED.[3292314] [22-713] [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:46 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3292315] [22-713] [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:47 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 7 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED