Consolidated
Lead case: 1:21-md-03010

New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:21-cv-08032
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331at Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Sep 28, 2021
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 27, 2022 5:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Facebook Inc.
770 Broadway
New York, NY 10003
Defendant
Google LLC
Plaintiff
Robinson Communications Inc
Represented By
Gregory F Wesner
Herman Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 04/10 11:17 AM
ORDER granting (136) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (137) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-03446-PKC; granting (934) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (935) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-md-03010-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06794-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06796-PKC; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06824-PKC; granting (79) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06828-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06817-PKC; granting (94) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (95) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06840-PKC; granting (271) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (272) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06841-PKC; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (120) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06870-PKC; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (98) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06871-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06881-PKC; granting (76) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (77) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06884-PKC; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (86) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06888-PKC; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (71) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06909-PKC; granting (80) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (81) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06910-PKC; granting (92) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (93) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06912-PKC; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07001-PKC; granting (179) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (180) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07034-PKC; granting (84) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (85) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-07045-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-06915-PKC; granting (63) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (64) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-08032-PKC; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-09523-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10186-PKC; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10187-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:21-cv-10188-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01693-PKC; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (62) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01701-PKC; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01704-PKC; granting (67) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01705-PKC; granting (59) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (60) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-01971-PKC; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-06997-PKC; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:22-cv-09810-PKC; granting (104) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01530-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-01532-PKC; granting (51) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-03651-PKC; granting (74) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (75) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:23-cv-05177-PKC; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-03063-PKC; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dena C. Sharp; Jonathan Rubin and Jonathan Laurence Rubin terminated in case 1:24-cv-09904-PKC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al. (Nacanther, Florence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
64 64 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:17 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance
63 63 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 04/09 5:12 PM
MOTION for Jonathan L Rubin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Cliffy Care Landscaping LLC, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical and Chiropractic Center, LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa, Kinin, Inc., Raintree Medical And Chiropractic Center LLC, Rodrock Chiropractic Pa.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-md-03010-PKC et al..(Rubin, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Appearance