Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-42600

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:21-ap-04215
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 04, 2021
Terminated:Mar 29, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Renaissance Restorations, Inc.
P.O. Box 1268
Birmingham, MI 48012
Represented By
Renaissance Restorations, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Jamie Craig
1502 W. 13 Mile Road
Royal Oak, MI 48073
Represented By
Jamie Craig
contact info
Plaintiff
Julian & Yochevet Tannenbaum
Represented By
Stuart Sandweiss
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
court Minute Entry. Case Closed Tue 05/17 4:59 PM
Minute Entry. Case Closed. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 18 Scheduling Order,Order Striking Document
Monday, May 02, 2022
court Minute Entry. Case Dismissed Tue 05/03 4:22 PM
Minute Entry. Case Dismissed. Related [+] (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
29 29 order Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/29 10:36 AM
Consent Judgment Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 28 Stipulation
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/29 10:37 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:21-ap-4215 : Settled. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/29 10:38 AM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-4215 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
28 28 motion Stipulated Settlement of Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/28 10:50 PM
Stipulated Settlement of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants . Filed by Defendants Jamie Craig, Renaissance Restorations, Inc., Plaintiffs Julian Tannenbaum, Yochevet Tannenbaum. (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 21, 2022
27 27 order Adjourning Hearing Mon 03/21 8:58 AM
Order of the Court: The parties have informed the Court that this adversary proceeding has been settled. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit an agreed order of dismissal or consent judgment, whichever is appropriate, no later than seven days after entry of this order. If Plaintiff does not comply with this requirement, the Court may dismiss this adversary proceeding, without prejudice. This order varies the procedure contained in L.B.R. 9019-1. Related [+] So Ordered by /s/ Judge Thomas J. Tucker (Vozniak, Mary)
Related: [-] Status Conference Report26 Status Conference Report filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc.
Friday, March 11, 2022
26 26 misc Status Conference Report Fri 03/11 3:35 PM
Status Conference Report Filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc.. (Hillary, Kim)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
25 25 misc Request for Admissions Mon 12/20 11:22 PM
Request for Admissions Filed by Plaintiffs Julian Tannenbaum, Yochevet Tannenbaum. (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Mon 12/20 11:14 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiffs Julian Tannenbaum, Yochevet Tannenbaum. (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 08, 2021
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/09 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 12/08/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order for Mediation
22 22 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 12/08 10:48 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc. Related [+]. (Hillary, Kim)
Related: [-] 14 Answer to Complaint
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Wed 12/08 9:35 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc. Related [+]. (Hillary, Kim)
Related: [-] 14 Answer to Complaint,16 Deficiency Notice
Monday, December 06, 2021
20 20 audio . Mon 12/06 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/6/2021 9:30:21 AM ]. File Size [ 2016 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:12 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
19 19 audio . Mon 12/06 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/6/2021 9:00:52 AM ]. File Size [ 9368 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:31 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Mon 12/06 11:06 AM
Adversary Proceeding Scheduling Order And Order Striking Plaintiff's Jury Demand Related [+]. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 5/2/2022 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St. Trial date set for 5/17/2022 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St. (kcm)
Related: [-] 3 Jury Demand
17 17 order Mediation Mon 12/06 10:20 AM
Order Appointing Mediator, Richardo I. Kilpatrick is appointed as Mediator. (kcm)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 12/06 8:48 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing and Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 12/13/2021. Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 12/13/2021. (kcm)
Related: [-] 14 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc.
court Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held Mon 12/06 9:54 AM
Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held; Scheduling order to follow. Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/02/2022 at 09:00AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. Trial date set for 05/17/2022 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. (lmoss)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Mon 12/06 1:31 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 12/06/2021 by the United States Postal Service to the non-ECF Participants-Bankruptcy Petition Preparer-Debtor(s) at His/Her Respective Address Appearing in the Records of the Court. Related [+] (TLC)
Related: [-] 17 Order for Mediation
Friday, December 03, 2021
15 15 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Fri 12/03 3:30 PM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiffs Julian Tannenbaum, Yochevet Tannenbaum. (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/03 3:21 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Renaissance Restorations, Inc.. (Hillary, Kim)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 11/08 12:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Jamie Craig. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 06, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/07 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/06/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Thursday, November 04, 2021
11 11 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Thu 11/04 9:02 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference. Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 12/6/2021 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 1925, 211 W. Fort St.. (lmoss) Note: effective beginning March 16, 2020, Judge Tucker is conducting all conferences and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. At least five minutes before the scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (888)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 03, 2021
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/03 7:01 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Jamie Craig. (Miller, Anthony)
Related: [-]
9 9 order stipulated order Wed 11/03 4:27 PM
Order Extending Deadline To Answer Complaint. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc.
8 8 misc Stipulation Wed 11/03 3:42 PM
Stipulation By and Between Debtor/Defendant and Plaintiffs Re: Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint . Filed by Defendant Renaissance Restorations, Inc.. (Hillary, Kim)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 17, 2021
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Sun 10/17 3:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jamie Craig 10/5/2021; Renaissance Restorations, Inc. 10/5/2021 (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/15 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
5 5 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Tue 10/12 2:28 PM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Jamie Craig . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 10/19/2021. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/05 10:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on Jamie Craig 10/5/2021; Renaissance Restorations, Inc. 10/5/2021 (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 04, 2021
3 3 utility Jury Demand Mon 10/04 9:21 PM
Jury Demand by Julian & Yochevet Tannenbaum Filed by Plaintiffs Julian & Yochevet Tannenbaum, Julian & Yochevet Tannenbaum Related [+]. (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 10/04 9:18 PM
Summons Issued on Renaissance Restorations, Inc. Answer Due 11/3/2021; Jamie Craig Answer Due 11/3/2021 (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 10/04 9:18 PM
Adversary case 21-04215 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)): Complaint by Julian & Yochevet Tannenbaum against Renaissance Restorations, Inc., Jamie Craig. Fee Amount $350. (Sandweiss, Stuart)
Related: [-]