Member Case
Lead case is: 2:21-bk-21053

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:21-bk-21055
Case Filed:Oct 05, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Extrusion Group Services, LLC
5665 Atlanta Hwy Ste 102B-204
Alpharetta, GA 30004-3959
Represented By
William A. Rountree
Rountree Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
53 53 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 4:42 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/12/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
52 52 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 4:41 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
51 51 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 4:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
50 50 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 4:40 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 04/30/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
49 49 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 4:39 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 4:38 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/29/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report (UST Form 11-MOR) Fri 11/08 12:54 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2024 filed by Caitlyn Powers on behalf of Extrusion Group Services, LLC. (Powers, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]