Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-33109

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:21-ap-03925
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2021
Terminated:Mar 08, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Driven, Inc.
Represented By
Driven, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald J. Sommers
2800 Post Oak Blvd. 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Ronald J. Sommers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/08 8:51 AM
Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3925 Closed. (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 05, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Sat 03/05 1:24 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Ronald J. Sommers (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 05, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 02/05 11:19 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Order
Thursday, February 03, 2022
8 8 order Generic Order Thu 02/03 9:46 AM
COPY OF Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Compromise with Driven, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 2/3/2022 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] Case No. 4-20-bk-33109 ECF No. 318
Friday, October 15, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate Fri 10/15 10:26 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Ronald J. Sommers ) Related [+] (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/15 10:25 AM
Summons Service Executed on Driven, Inc. 10/15/2021. (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/14 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order for Conference
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Tue 10/12 10:46 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 10/12 9:29 AM
Summons Issued on Driven, Inc. Date Issued 10/12/2021. (hler)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 10, 2021
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Sun 10/10 3:31 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Driven, Inc.. (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Sun 10/10 2:55 PM
Adversary case 21-03925 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 547 and 550 by Ronald J. Sommers against Driven, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]