Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-33109

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:21-ap-03926
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2021
Terminated:May 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Flow-Tech Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Flow-Tech Industries, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Ronald J Sommers
Nathan Sommers Jacobs 2800 Post Oak Blvd 61st Floor
Houston, TX 77056
Represented By
Ronald J Sommers
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Sunday, May 22, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Sun 05/22 6:10 PM
Voluntary Dismissal Under Rule 41. Adversary Case 4:21-ap-3926 Closed. (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/19 11:51 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/04 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/04/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Generic Order
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
14 14 order Generic Order Wed 03/02 3:50 PM
COPY OF Order Granting Trustee's Motion to Compromise with Flow-Tech Industries, Inc. Related [+] Signed on 3/2/2022 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] Case No. 20-33109 ECF No. 330
Sunday, February 13, 2022
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 02/13 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Vacating Order
Friday, February 11, 2022
12 12 order Vacating Order Fri 02/11 11:49 AM
Order Granting Motion to Vacate Judgment Against Defendant Flow-Tech Industries, Inc., Signed on 2/11/2022 Related [+] (TylerLaws)
Related: [-] 9 Judgment,11 Generic Motion
11 11 motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Fri 02/11 10:50 AM
Motion to Vacate Default Judgment Against Defendant Flow-Tech Industries, Inc. Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/09 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Judgment
Monday, February 07, 2022
9 9 order Judgment Mon 02/07 10:07 AM
Default Judgment in 4:21-ap-3926, Signed on 2/7/2022 (TylerLaws)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
court Hearing Set Tue 01/25 9:35 AM
Hearing Set On Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 2/8/2022 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, January 03, 2022
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 01/03 11:39 AM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Ronald J Sommers (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Friday, October 15, 2021
7 7 misc Certificate Fri 10/15 10:28 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Ronald J Sommers ) Related [+] (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Conference
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 10/15 10:27 AM
Summons Service Executed on Flow-Tech Industries, Inc. 10/15/2021. (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 14, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 10/14 11:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/14/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order for Conference
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 10/12 11:36 AM
Summons Issued on Flow-Tech Industries, Inc. Date Issued 10/12/2021. (hler)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order for Conference (FORM) (MULTI) Tue 10/12 10:46 AM
Order for Conference Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/8/2022 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 404 (MI). (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 10, 2021
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Sun 10/10 3:32 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Flow-Tech Industries, Inc. (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Sun 10/10 2:58 PM
Adversary case 21-03926 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 547 and 550 by Ronald J Sommers against Flow-Tech Industries, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Mayer, Simon)
Related: [-]