Original Case: 2:16-cv-02794

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-cv.pr-02166
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2021
Terminated:Feb 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 25, 2023 3:46 AM EST
Amicus Supporting Appellee
MEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
ADVANCEMENT PROJECT, NATIONAL OFFICE
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
ATLANTA WOMEN FOR EQUALITY
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
BAZELTON CENTER FOR MENTAL HEALTH LAW
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
BIRNBAUM WOMENS LEADERSHIP NETWORK AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
CHICAGO FOUNDATION FOR WOMEN
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
DISABILITY RIGHTS ADVOCATES
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
FAMILY EQUALITY
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
GEORGETOWN LAW - CENTER ON POVERTY AND INEQUALITY'S INITIATIVE ON GENDER JUSTICE & OPPORTUNITY
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
LAWYERS CLUB OF SAN DIEGO
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
LEGAL AID AT WORK
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL CENTER FOR YOUTH LAW
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL NETWORK TO END DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
THE WOMENS LAW CENTER OF MARYLAND, INCORPORATED
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
WOMEN LAWYERS ON GUARD INC.
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCIATION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
WOMEN'S BAR ASSOCIATION OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
JUVENILE DEFENDER ADVOCATE
Represented By
Aleksandra Boguslawa Chauhan
SOUTH CAROLINA COMMISSION ON INDIGENT DEFENSE
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL DISABILITY RIGHTS NETWORK
Represented By
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF COLORED PEOPLE
Represented By
Victor Goode
NAACP NATIONAL HEADQUARTERS
contact info
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Janette Louard
NAACP NATIONAL HEADQUARTERS
contact info
Anna Kathryn Barnes
NAACP NATIONAL HEADQUARTERS
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By
Sabrina Bernadel
NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
contact info
Adrian Gonzalez
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Dominique Jones
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Emily J. Martin
NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
contact info
Sunu Chandy
NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
contact info
Hunter Iannucci
NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
contact info
Courtney M. Dankworth
DEBEVOISE & PLIMPTON LLP
contact info
Amicus Supporting Appellee
NATIONAL POLICE ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Represented By
Trisha Suzanne Pande
PATTERSON HARKAVY, LLP
contact info
Keisha James
contact info
Eliana Machefsky
contact info
Lauren Bonds
contact info
Defendant
KEN MILLER, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Greenville, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
J. ALTON CANNON, JR., in his official capacity as the Sheriff of Charleston County, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
LUTHER T. REYNOLDS, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Charleston, SC
Defendant
REGINALD L. BURGESS, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of North Charleston, SC
Defendant
CARL RITCHIE, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Mt. Pleasant, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
LEON LOTT, in his official capacity as the Sheriff of Richland County, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
W. H. (SKIP) HOLBROOK, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Columbia, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
JOHNNY MACK BROWN, in his official capacity as the Interim Sheriff of Greenville County, SC
Defendant
LANCE CROWE, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Travelers Rest, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
STEVE MOORE, in his official capacity as Interim Chief of the Police Department of the City of Simpsonville, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
M. BRYAN TURNER, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Mauldin, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
DAN REYNOLDS, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Greer, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
A. KEITH MORTON, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Fountain Inn, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant
MICHAEL HANSHAW, in his official capacity as Interim Chief of the Police Department of the City of Simpsonville, SC
Defendant - Appellant
ALAN WILSON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of South Carolina
Represented By
Thomas T. Hydrick
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Alan Wilson
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ALAN WILSON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of South Carolina, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Plaintiff
TAUREAN NESMITH, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Plaintiff
NIYA KENNY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Plaintiff - Appellee
CAROLINA YOUTH ACTION PROJECT
Represented By
David Allen Chaney Jr.
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Shirene Carole Hansotia
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
S.P., by and through her next of kin Melissa Downs, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
David Allen Chaney Jr.
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Shirene Carole Hansotia
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
D.S., by and through her next of kin Juanita Ford, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
David Allen Chaney Jr.
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Shirene Carole Hansotia
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info

GPO Feb 22 2023
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-02794-MBS. [1001320143] [21-2166]
GPO Feb 22 2023
OPINION ATTACHMENTS. [1001320163] [21-2166]

Docket last updated: 02/25/2023 3:32 AM EST
Monday, October 18, 2021
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-02794-MBS. Case manager: TFischer. 21-2166 TF [Entered: 10/18/2021 11:53 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 2:16-cv-02794-MBS. Mailed to: Hansotia. 21-2166 TF [Entered: 10/18/2021 12:03 PM]
Related: [-]