Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-21053

Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:James R Sacca
Case #: 2:21-ap-02038
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Oct 22, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kimberly-Clark Corporation
Represented By
Kimberly-Clark Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC
600 Peachtree St. NE Suite 3000
Atlanta, GA 30308
Represented By
Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Extrusion Group, LLC
5665 Atlanta Hwy Suite 102B- 204
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
Benjamin Keck
Rountree, Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Extrusion Group Services, LLC
5665 Atlanta Hwy Suite 102B-204
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
Benjamin Keck
Rountree, Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EG Global, LLC
5665 Atlanta, Hwy Suite 102B-204
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
Benjamin Keck
Rountree, Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EG Ventures, LLC
5665 Atlanta Hwy Suite 102B-204
Alpharetta, GA 30004
Represented By
Benjamin Keck
Rountree, Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Micheal Houston
Represented By
Benjamin Keck
Rountree, Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Cook
Represented By
Benjamin Keck
Rountree, Leitman & Klein, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Saturday, January 27, 2024
57 57 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Sun 01/28 12:40 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice Notice Date 01/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
56 56 2 pgs notice Order and Notice Thu 01/25 11:32 AM
Order and Notice of Status Hearing. Service by BNC. Hearing to be held on 2/13/2024 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 103, Gainesville. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] Entered on 1/25/2024. Related [+] (jwc)
Related: [-] 1